Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Interjurisdictional Policing Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Interjurisdictional Policing Grant Program to provide counties with grants to defray costs associated with establishing and supporting interjurisdictional policing agreements; requiring the Governor, in each fiscal year, to provide $3,500,000 in the annual budget bill; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Program and establish certain requirements for the Program; specifying certain details regarding application procedures and grant awards; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1355
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Safety - Interjurisdictional Policing Grant Program - Establishment
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1501 through 4-1504 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:32 PM