Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Afzali, Grammer, Korman, McMillan, Moon, Morhaim, Parrott, Stein, Valderrama, Vogt, Hayes, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Miele, Saab, Morgan, Pendergrass, Hammen, Kipke, Cullison, Sample-Hughes, Barron, Reznik, West, Rose, Hill, Krebs, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing a licensing and regulatory system for the practice of direct-entry midwifery under the State Board of Nursing; establishing the Direct-Entry Midwifery Advisory Committee; requiring the Committee, beginning on November 1, 2016, to submit a specified annual report to the Board; requiring the Department of Legislative Services, on or before December 1, 2016, to compile and analyze specified data, report on the data to specified committees of the General Assembly, and provide the data to the Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0105
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
10/13/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {116381/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164533/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 10/13/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {116381/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 51
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {164533/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-208, 8-317, 8-6C-01 through 8-6C-26, 8-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM