Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsored by
The Speaker and Delegates Barve, Davis, Hammen, Hixson, McIntosh, Vallario, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that require State agencies to submit reports to the General Assembly that are deemed obsolete, duplicative, impractical, inefficient, or otherwise unnecessary; combining specified reporting requirements with other more extensive annual reports required to be submitted by State agencies; requiring the Department of Legislative Services, in consultation with agencies of the State government, to periodically review and make recommendations regarding specified reports that may no longer be warranted; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0220
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {446382/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {183325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2015 1/21/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable with Amendments {446382/1 Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 47
Senate 3/23/2015 3/24/2015 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Motion Reconsider Third Reading Adopted 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {183325/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 50
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-901, 5-704 )
(   5-1002 )
(   10-713, 14-102, 2-123, 3-404, 4-216, 5-315, 5-419, 5-512, 5-555, 6-307, 6-529 )
(   16-106 )
(   2-1107, 9-351 )
(   5-1309 )
(   10-207, 13-1002, 13-1004, 13-1013, 13-1102, 13-1104, 13-2105, 13-21A-02, 13-2504, 15-102.4, 15-124.2, 19-310.1 )
(   10-208, 10-306, 6-708 )
(   11-326, 14-102 )
(   10-219, 10-320, 5-608, 8-422, 9-312 )
(   1-104, 1-706, 3-3A-04, 4-210, 4-210.1, 4-2A-04, 4-746, 5-103, 5-1613, 5-307, 8-1808.1, 8-2103 )
(   14-505, 17-204, 5-7B-09, 5A-403, 7-314, 7-317 )
(   2-10A-03, 2-10A-07, 2-10A-13, 2-1209, 2-506, 9-1405 )
(   21-104, 21-108, 21-123, 21-125.1, 21-128 )
(   10-721, 10-725, 10-730, 10-732, 10-733 )
(   23-203, 6-201.2, 6-210, 8-309, 8-613 )
(   1983, 1984, 1987, 1991, 1994, 1995, 1996, 1997, 1999, 2001, 2002, 2003, 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2011, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM