Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure Replacement Surcharge
Sponsored by
Delegates Barkley, Barnes, Burns, Clagett, Davis, Feldman, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Impallaria, Ivey, Jameson, Kaiser, Love, Luedtke, McDermott, W. Miller, Minnick, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rudolph, Schulz, Summers, Vaughn, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a gas company to recover costs associated with infrastructure replacement projects through a gas infrastructure replacement surcharge on customer bills; requiring project cost calculations to include specified elements; specifying how the pretax rate of return is calculated and adjusted and what it includes; stating that the intent of the General Assembly is to accelerate infrastructure improvements by establishing a mechanism for gas companies to recover reasonable and prudent costs of infrastructure replacement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0008
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0662 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/15/2013
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803798/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/1 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/4 (Delegate Aumann) Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {923420/2 Rejected (23-104)
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-18)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
21
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2013 1/14/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/15/2013 1/15/2013 Hearing 1/24 at 3:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {803798/1 Report Adopted 17
House 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Motion Special Order until 2/1 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 17
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Special Order until 2/4 (Delegate Aumann) Adopted 18
House 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {923420/2 Rejected (23-104) 19
House 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 22
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (119-18) 22
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Finance 21
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM