Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on African American History and Culture - Duties
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Wilson, Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McMillan, Miele, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Commission on African American History and Culture to provide operational funding to a museum that specializes in African American history and culture.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0051
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0732 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {336082/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments {336082/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.5-401, 9.5-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM