Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and Compact
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Washington Metrorail Safety Commission and the Metrorail Safety Commission Interstate Compact; granting the Commission specified safety, regulatory, and enforcement authority over the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority; specifying the membership, powers, organization, and duties of the Commission; making the Act contingent upon the enactment of a similar Act by the Commonwealth of Virginia and by the District of Columbia; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {290517/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937871/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and Compact
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {290517/1 Adopted 35
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and Compact
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 37
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Rules 36
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {937871/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 56
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and Compact
Post Passage 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Text - Chapter - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and Compact
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM