Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Compliance by Nonresident Pharmacies and Repeal of Permit Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Bromwell, Cullison, Hammen, Kipke, Lam, Morhaim, Pendergrass, Ready, Reznik, K. Young, Angel, Barron, Hayes, Kelly, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Sample-Hughes, and West
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that specified entities hold a sterile compounding permit issued by the State Board of Pharmacy before engaging in activities relating to sterile compounding; repealing the requirement that a person that prepares and distributes sterile drug products into or within the State hold a specified permit; repealing the qualifications, fees, and other requirements for applying for a sterile compounding permit; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0069
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {456688/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 1/28/2015 1/29/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Favorable with Amendments {456688/1 Report Adopted 31
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 33
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-403, 12-4A-01 through 12-4A-12, 12-6C-03.2, 12-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM