Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Quarterly Audits
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Buckel, Cluster, Fisher, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Kipke, Kittleman, Long, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, Oaks, Parrott, Saab, Simonaire, Szeliga, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a local jurisdiction to obtain a quarterly audit of its speed monitoring systems conducted by a qualified independent person; and requiring the results of the audit to be kept on file and admitted as evidence in a specified proceeding.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1288 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM