Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Barron, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barve, Carr, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Kramer, Krimm, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that specified members of the board of directors of the Washington Metrorail Safety Commission be appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate; requiring one regular member of the board of directors of the Commission who is appointed by the Governor to be a resident of Montgomery County or Prince George's County; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0265
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37
Text - Third - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 40
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Referred Finance 40
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Text - Chapter - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM