Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates S. Robinson, Barve, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Hammen, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Love, Luedtke, Malone, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Niemann, Oaks, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Summers, F. Turner, M. Washington, Zucker, and Murphy
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Designating specified areas of the State as State wildlands.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0336
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {250412/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate McDermott) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {153828/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {163527/1 Rejected (41-91)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-35)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344936/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-35)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {250412/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate McDermott) Adopted 30
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {153828/1 Adopted 32
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {163527/1 Rejected (41-91) 32
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 35
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (100-35) 35
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 34
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {344936/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (101-35) 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM