Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Delegates Grammer, Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cluster, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, Long, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Rey, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vitale, Vogt, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a specified exception to the prohibition against carrying a deadly weapon on public school property; repealing the prohibition on the possession or use of specified firearm ammunition during and in relation to the commission of a crime of violence; altering the authorization for a person to wear, carry, or transport a handgun; repealing the designation of specified firearms as assault weapons; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/04/2015 Text - First - Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102, 4-110, 4-203, 4-301 through 4-306 )
(   3-208, 5-101, 5-110, 5-114, 5-115, 5-117.1, 5-118, 5-119, 5-120, 5-133, 5-133.1, 5-133.2, 5-133.3, 5-143, 5-144, 5-145, 5-146, 5-205, 5-206, 5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM