Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Study the Employment of Ethnic Minorities and Women Under Procurement Contracts at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, A. Washington, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Barron, Branch, Brooks, Carr, Carter, Conaway, Davis, Fennell, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Hill, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Knotts, McCray, Moon, Morhaim, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Vaughn, Walker, M. Washington, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Study the Employment of Ethnic Minorities and Women Under Procurement Contracts at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation; requiring the Commission to review, assess, and examine specified matters and to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM