Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 4/3/2020 11:54:35 PM
Friday, April 3, 2020
Friday, April 3, 2020
Other
Natalie M. Laprade Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission
Change made: April 3, 2020 4:32 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Natalie M. Laprade Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Other
April 22, 2020 2:00 PM to April 22, 2020 4:00 PM
Department of Legislative Services Building, Joint Hearing Room, Annapolis, MD
Votes on Licensure
Executive Director's Report
Update on Commission programs, legislative affairs, and regulations.
Committee and Staff Reports

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: April 3, 2020 12:40 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
April 9, 2020 9:00 AM to April 9, 2020 12:00 PM
7th Floor Board Room, Nancy S. Grasmick Education Bldg., 200 West Baltimore St., Baltimore, MD
Public meeting to discuss normal IAC agenda business.
REMOVED: 12:40 PM
Discussion of IAC agenda business.
ADDED: 12:40 PM

Student Data Privacy Council
Change made: April 3, 2020 1:43 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Student Data Privacy Council - Other
April 9, 2020 9:00 AM
Conference Call
(Previous Location: Harry Hughes Conference Center, MDOT Headquarters, 7201 Corporate Center Drive, Hanover, MD)
Monthly Meeting
1-855-797-9480 (US toll free)
ADDED: 1:43 PM
Access Code: 614-705-963
ADDED: 1:43 PM
To join by phone:
ADDED: 1:43 PM
+1-415-655-0045 (US toll)
ADDED: 1:43 PM

Change made: April 3, 2020 1:39 PM - HEARING ADDED
Student Data Privacy Council - Other
May 14, 2020 9:00 AM
Harry Hughes Conference Center, MDOT Headquarters, 7201 Corporate Center Drive, Hanover, MD
Monthly Meeting