Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/24/2020 5:36:09 PM
Friday, January 24, 2020
Senate
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Canceled
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Subsequent Injury Fund
Workers' Compensation Commission
MDOT Debt Service Requirements
DPSCS Community Supervision

Created: 1/17/2020 4:30 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
12:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/17/2020 4:44 PM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 4:44 PM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 4:44 PM)

House
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Appropriations Committee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Other
Baltimore County
Created: 1/21/2020 4:55 PM
Briefing
9:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 180
Score-Small business mentoring and education information - John Eckenrode
Bill Hearing
Baltimore County Public Schools Update- Dr. Darryl Williams, Superintendent
HB 27- Baltimore County-Sales and Use Tax Exemption-Qualified Opportunity Zones-Delegate Szeliga
HB110- Baltimore County-Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice-Lead Registry and Code Compliance-Pilot Program-Delegate Long