Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall Day
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Brooks, Carr, Carter, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Ghrist, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jackson, Jacobs, Jalisi, Jameson, Kaiser, Kipke, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McConkey, McCray, McIntosh, McKay, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, West, C. Wilson, P. Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim July 2 as Thurgood Marshall Day; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe Thurgood Marshall Day properly.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0889
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0939 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-411, 7-411 through 7-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM