Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Hammen, Hayes, McMillan, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Miele, Saab, Kelly, McDonough, Bromwell, Morgan, Morhaim, Pendergrass, Kipke, Sample-Hughes, Barron, Reznik, West, Rose, Hill, Krebs, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers; requiring the Council to study and make recommendations on improving the health and educational outcomes of students who receive services from school-based health centers; authorizing the State Department of Education to seek the assistance of specified organizations to provide specified staffing resources; requiring the Council to report to specified entities on its findings and recommendations on or before December 31 of each year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0403
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {246485/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {246485/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-4)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734339/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-8)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {246485/1 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Special Order until later today (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {246485/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-4) 51
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {734339/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (131-8) 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-4A-01, 7-4A-02, 7-4A-03, 7-4A-04, 7-4A-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM