Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food Deserts
Sponsored by
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Housing and Community Development)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the purposes of the Neighborhood Business Development Program to include helping to create specified small businesses and other food-related enterprises in food deserts; requiring the Business Development Program in the Neighborhood Business Development Program to provide financial assistance to projects in food deserts; authorizing specified entities to apply for financial assistance for a project in a food desert under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {570917/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {723727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-25)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {570917/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Special Order until 2/19 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 30
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {723727/1 Adopted 31
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
House 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (108-25) 33
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 32
Senate 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-301, 6-303, 6-304, 6-305, 6-308, 6-308.2, 6-308.3, 6-308.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM