Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Emergency Suspension of License
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Lottery and Gaming Control Agency)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to suspend a gaming license on an emergency basis if the suspension is necessary to protect the State's gaming program from specified harm; requiring the Commission to schedule a hearing on the suspension and notify the licensee of the suspension; authorizing the Commission to delegate specified authority to the Director of the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-12)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 35
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (119-12) 37
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 36
Senate 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM