Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Handgun Permits - Reciprocity
Sponsored by
Delegates Rey, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Beidle, Beitzel, Buckel, Carey, Ciliberti, Cluster, Fisher, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vitale, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a permit to carry a handgun, including a concealed handgun, issued to an individual by another state is valid in Maryland.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0454
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/10/2015 Text - First - Handgun Permits - Reciprocity
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-303, 5-303.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM