Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Folden, Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Angel, Arentz, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Buckel, Campos, Carozza, Cassilly, Cluster, Dumais, Ebersole, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jackson, Jacobs, Jalisi, Kelly, Kipke, Kittleman, Knotts, Kramer, Krebs, Krimm, Lisanti, Long, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McCray, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Rey, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Smith, Sophocleus, Sydnor, Szeliga, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vitale, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, C. Wilson, K. Young, P. Young, and Ciliberti
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation to establish a process by which a member of the General Assembly, another elected official, or any member of the general public may request that the Department dedicate a bridge or another appropriate structure under the jurisdiction of the Department to a specified deceased member of the armed forces or an emergency responder who died in the line of duty; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0802
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {160110/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447974/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {160110/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Finance 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {447974/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM