Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage Day
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora, Barve, A. Miller, Lee, Valderrama, Hammen, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Hubbard, Kach, A. Kelly, Kipke, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to proclaim annually October 2 as South Asian American Heritage Day; and requiring the proclamation to urge specified organizations to observe the month with specified activities.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0588
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {266384/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-2)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {266384/1 Report Adopted 36
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (130-2) 38
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-410, 7-410 through 7-412 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM