Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Wastewater Treatment Facilities - Financial Assistance Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Elliott, Afzali, Arora, Aumann, Bates, Beidle, Beitzel, Bobo, Boteler, Bromwell, Burns, Cane, Carr, Cluster, Conaway, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Dumais, Dwyer, Eckardt, Frank, Frush, George, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Hammen, Healey, Hogan, Holmes, Hough, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Impallaria, Jacobs, A. Kelly, K. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Lafferty, Love, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, McIntosh, McMillan, A. Miller, W. Miller, Murphy, Myers, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Norman, O'Donnell, Oaks, Otto, Parrott, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rudolph, Schulz, Serafini, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Tarrant, V. Turner, Valentino-Smith, Vitale, Weir, Wilson, and Wood
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with local government officials, to conduct a review of State programs that provide financial assistance for costs relating to the planning, design, construction, and upgrade of wastewater treatment facilities in the State; requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2013.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM