Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsored by
Delegates Hubbard, Afzali, Aumann, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Bates, Beidle, Bobo, Bohanan, Boteler, Braveboy, Bromwell, Cane, Cardin, Clagett, Cluster, Conaway, Costa, Cullison, Davis, DeBoy, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, Frush, Gaines, George, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Healey, Holmes, Hough, Howard, Hucker, Impallaria, Ivey, Kach, A. Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Krebs, Lafferty, Lee, Love, Luedtke, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, A. Miller, Minnick, Morhaim, Murphy, Myers, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Rudolph, Serafini, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Summers, Szeliga, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vaughn, Vitale, Walker, M. Washington, Weir, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a limitation on claiming the income tax credit for eligible long-term care insurance premiums for more than 1 year with respect to the same insured individual; altering the amount of the credit from a one-time $500 credit to an annual $200 credit; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0023
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0347 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-718 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM