Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Firearms - National Crime Information Center Participation
Sponsored by
Delegates Smigiel, Afzali, Aumann, Bates, Beitzel, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hogan, K. Kelly, Krebs, McComas, W. Miller, Myers, Norman, O'Donnell, Parrott, Schulz, Stifler, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the State to participate fully in the National Crime Information Center database system; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to ensure that all relevant information regarding individuals who are disqualified from possessing, using, selling, or transferring a firearm is submitted to the National Crime Information Center as soon as possible after disqualification; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM