Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Wireless Telecommunications Towers - Moratorium and Report
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan, Beidle, Carey, Chang, Frush, S. Howard, Kipke, Pena-Melnyk, Saab, Simonaire, Sophocleus, and Vitale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from constructing a wireless telecommunications tower on the grounds of a public school in Anne Arundel County from the effective date of the Act to June 30, 2016, unless specified permits have been issued; requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of Education to submit a specified report on the use of public school property for wireless telecommunications towers to the members of the Anne Arundel County delegation to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM