Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, S. Howard, Kipke, McMillan, Simonaire, and Vitale
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a procedure for the election and appointment of specified members of the Anne Arundel County Board of Education; repealing provisions governing the appointment of all members of the county board; requiring the County Executive of Anne Arundel County and the Governor to appoint specified members of the School Board Nominating Commission of Anne Arundel County; increasing the amount of compensation from $8,000 to $14,000 for the President of the County Board and from $6,000 to $12,000 for other board members; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0406
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-110, 3-114, 3-2A-01 through 3-2A-09, 3-2A-01 through 3-2A-10 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM