Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Anderson, B. Barnes, Barron, Campos, Carr, Fennell, Hettleman, Jalisi, Kelly, Korman, Lierman, Luedtke, Morales, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, S. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, A. Washington, Hammen, Angel, Bromwell, Hayes, Hill, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Pendergrass, Rose, Reznik, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the State Public Information Act Compliance Board and Office of the Public Access Ombudsman; requiring the Governor and the Attorney General to publish on their Web sites specified notice relating to specified applications and the names and qualifications of specified applicants; requiring the Governor to solicit specified recommendations from specified individuals; requiring the Board to report on specified matters to the Governor and General Assembly by October 1 of each year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0695
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {976783/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {394337/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {273127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {976783/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 60
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable with Amendments {394337/1 Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {273127/1 Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 65
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (126-0) 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-1A-01 through 4-1A-10, 4-1B-01 through 4-1B-04, 4-203, 4-206, 4-301, 4-361, 4-362 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM