Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Anderson, Arora, Aumann, Barnes, Barve, Burns, Cardin, Carr, Cluster, Cullison, DeBoy, Eckardt, Feldman, Frank, Frick, Haddaway-Riccio, Hubbard, Impallaria, Kaiser, Kipke, Kramer, Lafferty, Lee, Malone, McDermott, McDonough, A. Miller, W. Miller, Mizeur, Nathan-Pulliam, Olszewski, Pendergrass, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Sophocleus, Stein, Stifler, Stocksdale, Summers, Tarrant, Waldstreicher, Weir, Hammen, Bromwell, Costa, Elliott, Kach, A. Kelly, Krebs, Murphy, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt specified regulations if the Board determines that specified acts, laws, or amendments authorize or require the reduction of specified dollar amounts or alteration of specified parameters pertaining to specified investment activities in Iran; clarifying the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0811
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {626780/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments {626780/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-701, 17-702, 17-703, 17-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM