Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Cullison, Dumais, Hammen, Hayes, Kipke, Krebs, Miele, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Pendergrass, Reznik, Saab, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing immunity from civil liability for a specified person administering medications or treatment in response to an apparent drug overdose if the person is trained and certified under specified protocols established by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene; extending immunity under the Act to a corporation when its fire department personnel are immune under the Act; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM