Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship Maryland
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission) and Delegates Beitzel, Davis, Jones, McCray, Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Barkley, D. Barnes, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Clippinger, Ebersole, Fennell, Fisher, Frick, Glenn, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jameson, Kaiser, Kramer, Luedtke, Lisanti, Mautz, Metzgar, W. Miller, Patterson, Platt, Reilly, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Valderrama, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a 2-year pilot program called Apprenticeship Maryland to prepare students to enter the workforce; providing for the Program to begin in the summer of 2016; requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation and a specified entity to develop criteria for the selection of two local school systems and to consider, where practicable, one rural and one urban system; allowing for the participation of up to 60 students from each school system; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0772
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263898/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {237274/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendment
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {263898/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {237274/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 57
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendment 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-405, 11-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM