Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Certified Nurse Practitioners - Authority to Practice
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Kelly, Kipke, Pena-Melnyk, Hayes, McMillan, Oaks, Miele, Saab, McDonough, Bromwell, Morgan, Angel, Pendergrass, Hammen, Sample-Hughes, Barron, Reznik, West, Rose, Krebs, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition against a certified nurse practitioner practicing in the State unless the nurse practitioner has an approved attestation that the nurse practitioner has an agreement for collaboration and consulting with a specified physician and will practice in accordance with specified standards; requiring applicants for initial certification as a nurse practitioner to identify, on the certification application, a certified nurse practitioner or licensed physician to act as mentor for 18 months; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0723
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {346289/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {346289/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 60
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-101, 8-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM