Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Pendergrass, Anderson, Angel, B. Barnes, Barve, Carr, Cassilly, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Hammen, Hettleman, Jameson, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lam, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Vaughn, A. Washington, West, C. Wilson, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a qualified patient to request aid in dying by making specified requests; prohibiting an individual from requesting aid in dying on behalf of a patient; requiring a written request for aid in dying to meet specified requirements; establishing specified requirements for witnesses to a written request for aid in dying; requiring a written request for aid in dying to be in a specified form; requiring an attending physician who receives a written request for aid in dying to make a specified determination; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0676
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-102, 3-103 )
(   5-6A-01 through 5-6A-16 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM