Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Wilson, Barron, Morgan, Valderrama, Walker, A. Washington, Hammen, Angel, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, Sample-Hughes, West, K. Young, and Valentino-Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing March 30 as Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day in recognition of the service and sacrifice of Vietnam veterans from the State of Maryland; and making the act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0080
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {226082/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Valentino-Smith) {293725/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable with Amendments {226082/1 Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Valentino-Smith) {293725/1 Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Astle) Adopted 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-402, 7-402 through 7-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM