Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Ratemaking Structure - Review by Office of Legislative Audits PG/MC 108-16
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits, on or before December 31, 2016, to complete a review that compares the ratemaking structure of the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission with other water and sewer utilities in the State and nationally that meet specified qualifications.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654762/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments {654762/1 Report Adopted 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 45
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM