Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Reliability - Priorities and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Barkley, Haddaway-Riccio, Impallaria, Jameson, Love, Olszewski, Schuh, Stifler, Vaughn, Feldman, Hershey, Minnick, and Schulz
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission and specified electric companies to establish priorities for remediation projects; establishing an Electric Reliability Remediation Fund in the Commission; providing for the purpose, administration, investment, sources, and permissible uses of the Fund; requiring specified electric companies to maintain the reliability of their distribution systems in accordance with specified standards; requiring that specified civil penalties be paid into the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943394/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {943394/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 48A
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Finance 48
Senate 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-201, 7-213, 7-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM