Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Health Care Practitioners
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Bromwell, Carr, Cullison, Glenn, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, A. Kelly, Love, McComas, McDermott, Mitchell, Morhaim, Parrott, Sophocleus, Valderrama, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from intentionally causing physical injury to another if the person knows or has reason to know that the other is a health care practitioner engaged in performing the practitioner's official duties; establishing a specified penalty; and defining the term "health care practitioner".
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1099 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-201, 3-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM