Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Ali, Barkley, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Conaway, Fennell, Frick, Gibson, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Kramer, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, McCray, Mosby, Rosenberg, Valderrama, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board of education to award certain credit to a high school student for work-based training or classroom instruction completed under a registered apprenticeship program; authorizing a county board to count toward high school attendance the time an apprentice or youth apprentice spends during work-based training; prohibiting certain institutions from referring to certain courses as an apprenticeship or apprenticeship training course unless the course is part of a registered apprenticeship training program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0618
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {175165/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {234333/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Career Youth Apprenticeship and Apprenticeship in State Employment Opportunity Act
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {175165/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Career Youth Apprenticeship and Apprenticeship in State Employment Opportunity Act
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 47A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {234333/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Text - Chapter - Career Youth and Public Sector Apprenticeship Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-123, 21-204, 7-205.4, 7-301.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM