Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Frederick Douglass and Harriet Tubman Memorial Statues - Placement and Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell, Afzali, Anderson, Aumann, Bates, Beidle, Beitzel, Branch, Braveboy, Bromwell, Burns, Cane, Cardin, Carr, Carter, Clagett, Cluster, DeBoy, Donoghue, Eckardt, Elliott, Feldman, Fisher, Frank, Frush, George, Glass, Glenn, Griffith, Haddaway-Riccio, Haynes, Healey, Hershey, Hogan, Holmes, Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Jameson, Jones, Kach, A. Kelly, K. Kelly, Krebs, Lafferty, McComas, McDermott, McIntosh, W. Miller, Morhaim, Myers, Niemann, Norman, Oaks, Otto, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Ready, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Stein, Stifler, Stocksdale, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Vitale, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Weir, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a Frederick Douglass Memorial Statue and a Harriet Tubman Memorial Statue be placed on the grounds of the State House, one on each side of the Roger Brooke Taney Statue; establishing the Commission on the Frederick Douglass and Harriet Tubman Memorial Statues; requiring the Commission to develop and implement a process to create specified memorial statues and take other specified action relating to the creation of the memorial statues; terminating the Commission on June 30, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1371 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1016, 9-1021 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM