Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax Limitations
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Barnes, Barve, Carr, Cullison, Gutierrez, Hucker, Luedtke, S. Robinson, Simmons, Waldstreicher, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "cost", as it relates to the authority of special counties to create special taxing districts, to include specified operating expenses; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county to set special rates for any class of property in a special taxing district that is subject to the county property tax and to set a property tax rate in a special taxing district that is higher than the county tax limitation, notwithstanding specified provisions of law or a county charter; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0627
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-501, 21-701 )
(   6-302, 6-302.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM