Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Agriculture to implement, subject to available funding in the State budget, a program to use Bacillus thuringiensis israelensis to control or eliminate nuisance insects in the State; requiring the program to be implemented on State-owned property, local government property with consent, and private property with the owner's consent; requiring that a certain notice be provided to certain entities and posted on certain social media sites; establishing the Nuisance Insects Fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {694530/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {563626/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {694530/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Floor Amendment {563626/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0) 61
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1001 through 5-1005 )
(   8-2201 through 8-2205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM