Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges - Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 430-17
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a specified cap on the school facilities surcharge in Prince George's County for specified residential construction that abuts an existing or planned mass transit rail station site operated by the Maryland Transit Administration; authorizing the Prince George's County Council to reduce the school facilities surcharge by a percentage not to exceed 50% for dwelling units in multifamily housing constructed within a specified distance of the Purple Line station; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {230710/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284535/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges - Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 430-17
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {230710/1 Adopted 57
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges - Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 430-17
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 58
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Referred Rules 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/30/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {284535/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges - Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 430-17
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges - Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 430-17
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM