Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland School for the Deaf - Employees - Annual and Personal Leave
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland School for the Deaf)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain employees of the Maryland School for the Deaf are not entitled to annual leave with pay; and clarifying that employees of the Maryland School for the Deaf who work 11 months or less in a calendar year are entitled to a certain amount of personal leave with pay for each calendar year under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/26/2018
Legislative Date
10/26/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland School for the Deaf - Employees - Annual and Personal Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland School for the Deaf - Employees - Annual and Personal Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland School for the Deaf - Employees - Annual and Personal Leave
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/26/2018 10/26/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland School for the Deaf - Employees - Annual and Personal Leave
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Favorable Adopted 15
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Second Reading Passed 15
Text - Third - Maryland School for the Deaf - Employees - Annual and Personal Leave
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 17
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Referred Appropriations 18
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Text - Chapter - Maryland School for the Deaf - Employees - Annual and Personal Leave
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM