Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland Program
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Business and Economic Development)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the uses and composition of the Enterprise Fund in the Department of Business and Economic Development; authorizing the Department to acquire an ownership interest exceeding 25% when making an equity investment in one or more venture or private equity firms; restricting to a specified percentage the Department's allocation of designated capital in specified side car funds under the Invest Maryland Program; expanding specified prohibitions to apply to a specified purchaser of tax credits; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
11/05/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {639136/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {305066/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (107-25)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 11/05/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments {639136/1 Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 45
House 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {305066/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (107-25) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-602, 5-603, 6-501, 6-511, 6-518, 6-520, 6-521, 6-522, 6-529 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM