Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Insurance Administration, Maryland)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing initial permit, permit renewal, and permit reinstatement fees for a SHOP Exchange enrollment permit; specifying that provisions of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act relating to guaranteed availability of coverage apply to specified coverage offered in specified insurance markets; repealing specified conversion rights for specified group and blanket health insurance contracts; repealing provisions of law governing bona fide wellness programs; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/07/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2014
Legislative Date
1/02/2014
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {537177/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-7)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-41)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/07/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/02/2014 1/02/2014 Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {537177/1 Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (38-7) 25
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 28
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (95-41) 58
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1005, 15-1009, 15-1208.1, 15-1208.2, 15-1210, 15-1212, 15-1301, 15-1303, 15-1316, 15-137.1, 15-414, 15-509, 2-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM