Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Clarification
Sponsored by
Senator Peters (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a member of the State Retirement and Pension System may not receive creditable service for unused sick leave at retirement unless the leave was available to the member to be used as sick leave during employment; and clarifying the definition of "unused sick leave" to specify that the leave must have been available to be used as sick leave during employment.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0217
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM