Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Constitutional Officers - Salaries
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Governor's Salary Commission)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for the annual salaries of the Comptroller, Treasurer, Attorney General, and Secretary of State; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0230
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-34)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 57
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/02/2014 4/02/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (102-34) 67
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-103, 5-104, 6-103, 7-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM