Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Ferguson, Hershey, Hough, Norman, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and McFadden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Program; requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Higher Education Commission, to administer the Program; requiring P-TECH students to be included in the full-time equivalent enrollment calculation; requiring the Department, in consultation with the Commission, to submit an analysis of the Program's success in preparing students for the workforce or for additional education; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0413
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434033/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means Appropriations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {735563/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {434033/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 33
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Ways and Means Appropriations 36
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {735563/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Text - Chapter - Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-305, 16-502, 5-202, 7-1801, 7-1802 through 7-1806 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:35 AM