Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Unregistered Emergency Vehicles - Operating on Highways
Sponsored by
Senator Brinkley
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the Maryland Vehicle Law does not preclude a local authority from authorizing an emergency vehicle not subject to registration to operate on a highway under its jurisdiction while performing an emergency service.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0680
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108474/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments {108474/1 Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM