Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - English Language Learner Liaison Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Currie, King, Montgomery, Ramirez, Rosapepe, and Benson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the English Language Learner Liaison Pilot Program in the State Department of Education; requiring the Department to implement the Program in Prince George's County; specifying the purpose of the Program is to address the specific needs of English language learner students and their families; requiring the Department to report annually to specified committees of the General Assembly; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424531/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-7)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments {424531/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Second Reading Passed 70
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (130-7) 72
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-437 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM