Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need Review
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Brinkley, Brochin, Colburn, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Dyson, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Getty, Gladden, Glassman, Hershey, Jacobs, Jennings, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Miller, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Reilly, Robey, Rosapepe, Shank, Simonaire, Stone, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, beginning December 31, 2014, the State health plan methodologies, standards, and criteria for licensed hospice certificate of need review shall use specified data from specified years to calculate a specified volume threshold; requiring the Commission, in collaboration with the Hospice and Palliative Care Network, to incorporate in a specified methodology recognition that hospice utilization may be influenced by a specified demographic makeup; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1253
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997478/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {997478/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 51
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM